VA HB1641 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; powers and duties of regulatory boards; waiver of informal fact-finding conference. Requires any regulator board within the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation to provide a regulant subject to a disciplinary action with a notice advising the regulant of his right to be heard at an informal fact-finding conference pursuant to the Administrative Process Act. The bill requires that the notice state that if the regulant does not request an informal fact-finding conference within 30 days of receipt of the notice, the board may issue a case decision with judicial review of the case decision. If the regulant asserts his right to be heard prior to the board issuing its case decision, the board shall remand the case to an informal fact-finding conference. The bill provides that the required notice is to be sent by certified mail, return receipt requested or, if agreed to by the parties, electronic means, provided that the board retains sufficient proof of the electronic delivery, which may be an electronic receipt of delivery, a confirmation that the notice was sent by facsimile, or a certificate of service prepared by the sender confirming the electronic delivery.
Title
Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of; powers and duties of regulatory boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 486 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1641ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 13101302D-E |
2013-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1641E |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101302D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1179 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)