VA SB1179 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; powers and duties of regulatory boards; waiver of informal fact-finding conference. Requires any regulator board within the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation to provide a regulant subject to a disciplinary action with a notice advising the regulant of his right to be heard at an informal fact-finding conference pursuant to the Administrative Process Act. The bill requires that the notice state that if the regulant does not request an informal fact-finding conference within 30 days of receipt of the notice, the board may issue a case decision with judicial review of the case decision. If the regulant asserts his right to be heard prior to the board issuing its case decision, the board shall remand the case to an informal fact-finding conference. The bill provides that the required notice is to be sent by certified mail, return receipt requested or, if agreed to by the parties, electronic means, provided that the board retains sufficient proof of the electronic delivery, which may be an electronic receipt of delivery, a confirmation that the notice was sent by facsimile, or a certificate of service prepared by the sender confirming the electronic delivery.
Title
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; powers and duties of regulatory boards.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 398 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1179ER) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13101303D-E |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1179E |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101303D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1641 (Same As) 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486)