VA HB164 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Colonial Beach; chief of police. Provides that the chief of police for the Town of Colonial Beach in Westmoreland County shall be appointed by and serve at the pleasure of the town manager rather than the town council. Charter; Town of Colonial Beach; chief of police. Provides that the chief of police for the Town of Colonial Beach in Westmoreland County shall be appointed by and serve at the pleasure of the town manager rather than the town council.
Title
Colonial Beach, Town of; amending charter, appointment of chief of police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 227 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB164ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101100D |