VA HB164 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Contractors; prerequisites to obtaining a building permit; elimination of affidavit requirement. Removes the requirement that a building permit applicant's written statement that he is not subject to licensure or certification as a contractor or subcontractor be supported by an affidavit. The bill contains technical amendments and is identical to SB 529.
Title
Contractors, Board for; prerequisites to obtaining a building permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 37 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 1, 2018 | |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/22/18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB164ER) |
2018-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102001D |