VA HB164 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
High school graduation; verified units of credit. Directs the Board of Education, in establishing course and credit requirements for a high school diploma, to require students to earn no more than six verified units of credit to graduate with an advanced studies diploma and no more than four verified units of credit to graduate with a standard diploma.
Title
High school graduation; verified units of credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Education |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2015-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100819D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB164 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB164+hil |