VA HB164 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Background checks of applicants of the Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. Authorizes the chief of the Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority police department, or his designee, to conduct criminal background checks through the Central Criminal Records Exchange and the Federal Bureau of Investigation on applicants who have been conditionally offered employment with the Authority. The applicant's criminal history record information obtained by the chief must otherwise be kept confidential. The bill also establishes criteria that the Authority must consider in determining whether an applicant's criminal conviction directly relates to the position offered.
Title
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority; background checks of applicants.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057) | |
2014-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 57 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB164ER) |
2014-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-27 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102397D-E |
2014-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB164E |
2014-01-24 | House | Amendment by Delegate Albo agreed to |
2014-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2013-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102397D |