VA HB1630 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (14-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Substitute judges; powers and duties; entry of a final order. Provides that a substitute judge has the power to enter a final order in any case heard by the substitute judge for a period of 14 days after the date of a hearing of such case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judges, substitute; powers and duties, entry of a final order.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenatePassed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (14-Y 1-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19100888D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1630E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-07HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-10-29HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-10-29HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100888D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16169.21(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback