VA HB1628 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative; prohibition on participation by Commonwealth. Prohibits the Governor or any state agency from adopting any regulation establishing a carbon dioxide cap-and-trade program or bringing about the participation by the Commonwealth in a regional market for the trading of carbon dioxide allowances. The bill provides that the Commonwealth shall be allowed to participate in such a cap-and-trade program if the House of Delegates and the Senate of Virginia each adopt a resolution by a majority vote that specifically references and approves the regulatory text proposed for adoption by a state agency.
Title
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative; prohibition on participation by Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105559D |