VA HB1624 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Host Cities Economic Development Incentive and Host Cities Transportation Support Funds. Creates the Host Cities Economic Development Incentive Fund, administered by the Secretary of Commerce and Trade, to support economic development, growth of existing businesses, and job creation related to the Port of Virginia in one or more host cities. The bill also creates the Host Cities Transportation Support Fund, administered by the Secretary of Transportation, to support transportation projects and facilities related to the Port of Virginia in one or more host cities.
Title
Host Cities Economic Development Incentive and Host Cities Transportation Support Funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources and Technology |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102451D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1624 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1624+hil |