VA HB162 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Proceeds of a sale, a partition suit, or condemnation proceeding; persons under a disability; special needs trust. Increases the amount of funds that a court can distribute, without the intervention of a fiduciary, to a person under a disability who is the recipient of those funds pursuant to a suit for the sale or lease of lands, a partition suit, or condemnation proceedings. The bill further provides that such funds may be distributed to a special needs trust at the request of an appointed fiduciary or guardian ad litem of the person under a disability or upon the court's own motion.
Title
Proceeds of a sale, a partition suit, or condemnation proceeding; persons under a disability, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 124 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB162ER) |
2018-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB162H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18104726D-H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 18104726D-H1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101212D |