VA HB1616 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Hopewell. Exempts from a referendum requirement bonds issued for the construction, improvement, expansion, or replacement of existing public buildings or facilities, and authorizes the City to replace existing buildings or facilities on an alternative site.
Title
Hopewell, City of; amending charter, issuance of bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 596 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1616ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 20103276D-E |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1616E |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20103276D |