VA HB1616 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Use or display of firearm during commission of a felony; killing or injuring police animals; penalty. Adds maliciously shooting, stabbing, wounding, or otherwise causing bodily injury to or administering poison to any animal used or trained by a law-enforcement agency, regional jail, or the Department of Corrections to the list of felonies for which a separate penalty is prescribed if a firearm is used during the commission of the offense.
Title
Firearms; use or display during commission of a felony, killing or injuring police animals, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2018-09-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-09-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100125D |