VA HB1614 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0344)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Local Stormwater Management Fund. Authorizes a locality by ordinance to create a local Stormwater Management Fund consisting of appropriated local moneys for the purpose of granting funds to an owner of private property or a common interest community for stormwater management and erosion prevention on previously developed lands. This bill is identical to SB 1248.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stormwater Management Fund, local; locality by ordinance authorized to create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0344)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 344 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1614ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106792D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1614S1
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106792D-S1
2019-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106792D-S1
2019-02-12SenateReported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19100149D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1614E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-08-28HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2018-08-28HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100149D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152958.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1614
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1614+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1614E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1614S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1614ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0344+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0703V0002+HB1614
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0031+HB1614
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2342+HB1614
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0085+HB1614
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1614+HB1614
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB1614+HB1614
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3037+HB1614

Bill Comments

feedback