VA HB1610 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Defective Chinese drywall; disclosure, assessed value, real estate tax exemption. Requires licensees engaged by sellers and buyers, and landlords who have actual knowledge of defective Chinese drywall in a dwelling unit, to disclose that information to the prospective tenant or buyer. If a tenant is not provided disclosure within 60 days of discovery of defective drywall he may terminate the lease. The bill also provides, upon confirmation by a building official that defective Chinese drywall is present, that the commissioner or other assessing official may reassess the property accordingly. Local governments may also designate the property as a rehabilitation district for purposes of granting the owner a partial real estate tax exemption. This bill is a recommendation of the Housing Commission.
Title
Defective Chinese drywall; disclosure of information, real estate tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034) | |
2011-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 34 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1610ER) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1610H1 | |
2011-01-25 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104353D-H1 | |
2011-01-25 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-20 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104353D-H1 | |
2011-01-20 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2011-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100912D |
Same As/Similar To
SB949 (Same As) 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2131 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2134 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2135 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3284.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |