VA HB161 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying a concealed handgun; permit not required. Allows any person who is otherwise eligible to obtain a resident concealed handgun permit to carry a concealed handgun without a permit anywhere he may lawfully carry a handgun openly within the Commonwealth.
Title
Carrying a concealed handgun; permit not required.
Sponsors
Sen. John McGuire [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2019-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103487D |