VA HB1599 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1599
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; staffing ratios; librarians. Requires school boards to employ librarians in accordance with the following ratios: in elementary schools, one part-time to 299 students, one full-time at 300 students, and two full-time at 700 students; in middle schools, one-half time to 299 students, one full-time at 300 students, two full-time at 800 students, and three full-time at 1,700 students; and in high schools, one half-time to 299 students, one full-time at 300 students, two full-time at 900 students, and three full-time at 1,800 students. Under current law, school boards are required to employ librarians in accordance with the following ratios: in elementary schools, one part-time to 299 students and one full-time at 300 students; in middle schools, one-half time to 299 students, one full-time at 300 students, and two full-time at 1,000 students; and in high schools, one half-time to 299 students, one full-time at 300 students, and two full-time at 1,000 students.
Title
School boards; staffing ratios for librarians.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Education |
2020-01-29 | House | Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105467D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1599 (Carry Over) 2020-01-29 - Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote