VA HB1594 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Outdoor advertising. Allows county governing bodies to take over from the Commissioner of Highways the regulation of authorized outdoor advertising or notices that are on public park or school property owned by the county and are not visible from interstates or other components of the National Highway System.
Title
Outdoor advertising; regulation by county governing bodies.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 607 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1594ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1594H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104425D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104425D-H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100491D |