VA HB1589 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Defeated by Senate (13-Y 26-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Defeated by Senate (13-Y 26-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Order of publication; use of electronic medium. Provides that a court may direct that an order of publication be electronically posted using an electronic medium chosen by the court, in lieu of directing such order be published in a newspaper.
Title
Order of publication; use of electronic medium.
Sponsors
Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Michael Webert [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (13-Y 26-N) (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (15-Y 22-N) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (15-Y 22-N) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (13-Y 26-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (15-Y 22-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101168D-E |
2017-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1589E |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101168D |