VA HB1577 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Management of menhaden. Requires the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to adopt regulations to implement the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission Fishery Management Plan for Atlantic Menhaden and authorizes the Commission to adopt regulations for managing the Commonwealth's menhaden fishery. The bill also requires that any moratorium on the fishery be subject to legislative review. The bill repeals several Code sections relating to quotas, allocation of allowable landings, and administrative procedures that will be included in a regulatory framework for managing the fishery.
Title
Management of menhaden.
Sponsors
Del. Barry Knight [R] | Del. Terry Austin [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] |
Del. Riley Ingram [R] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2017-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101083D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Marine Products Science and Resources
Menhaden Fish
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Marine Products Science and Resources
Menhaden Fish
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1000.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 400.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 400.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1577 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1577+hil |