VA HB157 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB157
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation (8-Y 7-N)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation (8-Y 7-N)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Duties of drivers of vehicles approaching stationary vehicles displaying certain warning lights; penalty. Makes a driver's failure to (i) move into a nonadjacent lane on a highway with at least four lanes when approaching a stationary towing vehicle or incident or traffic management vehicle displaying flashing, blinking, or alternating amber lights or (ii) proceed with due caution and maintain a safe speed when passing such a vehicle reckless driving, which is punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor. Under current law, such offense is a traffic infraction punishable by a fine of not more than $250, and a failure to so move or proceed with due caution when approaching other such listed vehicles is reckless driving.
Title
Drivers of vehicles approaching stationary vehicles displaying certain warning lights; duties, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Transportation (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Transportation (8-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2019-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101726D |
Same As/Similar To
HB157 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation (8-Y 7-N)