VA HB1551 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign advertisements; independent expenditures; electioneering communications; disclaimer requirements. Broadens the scope of disclaimer requirements for campaign advertisements to include electioneering communications, as defined in the bill, and messages advocating for the passage or defeat of a referendum. The bill also requires an advertisement that is an independent expenditure or that expressly advocates for the passage or defeat of a referendum to contain a disclaimer providing the names of the advertisement sponsor's three largest contributors.
Title
Campaign advertisements; independent expenditures, electioneering communications, disclaimer.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2023-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100661D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 945.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 945.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 955 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 955.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 956 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 956.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 957.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 957.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 957.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 958.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 958.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 958.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |