VA HB1551 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Discovery rule; statute of limitations. Provides that the period of limitations for filing a cause of action for injury resulting from implanted medical devices, toxic exposure, and prescribed or over-the-counter medications accrues from the time the person knew or should have known of the injury and its causal connection to such device, substance, or medication.
Title
Discovery rule; statute of limitations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil |
2013-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101756D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1551 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1551+hil |