VA HB1547 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices; sexual orientation and gender identity. Adds discrimination on the basis of an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity as an unlawful housing practice. The bill defines sexual orientation and gender identity.
Title
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18100858D |