VA HB1503 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Accreditation. Adds high school graduation rates, the college and career readiness of graduates, the rate of student academic progress in all student subgroups identified pursuant to the federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965, P.L. 89-10, as amended, and progress toward narrowing gaps in student proficiency on Standards of Learning assessments among all student subgroups to the list of special school division accomplishments that the Board of Education shall consider in its criteria for recognizing educational performance. The bill also requires the Board to establish a range of accreditation rankings to identify achievements, progress, and gaps in school performance and prohibits the Board from awarding a school the highest level of accreditation if any such student subgroup in the school fails to demonstrate proficiency on any Standards of Learning assessment. The bill finally alters the objectives of Standards of Learning Assessments. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Standards of Accreditation; adds high school graduation rates, college readiness of graduates, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2013-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Standards Of Quality |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100725D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1503 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1503+hil |