VA HB1498 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
Summary
Certificate of Public Need. Permits the Commissioner to issue a Request For Applications, and to accept applications for 120 new nursing home or nursing facility beds in Planning District 3. This bill also requires the Commissioner to consider, in issuing any certificate of public need for 120 beds, an applicant that proposes to establish a new nursing facility located within three miles of the boundary of the county seat or within the county seat of the county adjacent to the city or county in which is sited any facility in Planning District 3 determined by the Division of Certificate of Public Need to be licensed for 120 beds but that operated no Medicaid-certified beds in 2006.
Title
Nursing home or facility beds; Health Commissioner may accept and issue applications therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 802 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1498ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Rereferred to Education and Health | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 084831588-E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1498E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources (Hamilton) | |
2008-01-29 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-29 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-17 | House: Presented and ordered printed 084831588 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1498 |