VA HB1486 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0706)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0706)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Life, Accident and Sickness Insurance Guaranty Association. Amends the methodology for allocating assessments for long-term care insurance written by an impaired or insolvent insurer. The measure requires that 50 percent of such assessments be allocated to health insurers and 50 percent to life insurers. The measure provides that health maintenance organizations (HMOs) will participate in the Guaranty Association. Provisions that established an alternative method to address insolvencies of HMOs are repealed. The measure also updates terminology and makes conforming amendments based on proposed changes to the National Association of Insurance Commissioners' Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association model act.
Title
Va. Life, Accident & Sickness Insurance Guaranty Assoc.; assessments for long-term care insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0706) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 706 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1486ER) |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (73-Y 24-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1486H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106602D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106602D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 8-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104701D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |