VA HB1482 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - VOTE: DEFEATED (63-Y 37-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - VOTE: DEFEATED (63-Y 37-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Vacant buildings; registration. Permits any city and certain towns to require, by ordinance, the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and that may endanger the public health, safety, or welfare to register such building annually. Under current law, any city and certain towns are permitted to require the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and meets the definition of "derelict building" in relevant law to register such building annually.
Title
Vacant building; registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (63-Y 37-N) (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (63-Y 37-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (requires 67 affirmative votes to pass) (63-Y 37-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1482H1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105589D-H1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Incorporates HB1612 (Angelia Williams Graves) |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105589D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102609D |