VA HB1480 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
Summary
Allowances to injured deputy sheriffs. Requires a locality to allow a deputy sheriff injured in the line of duty to use accrued vacation, compensatory, and sick leave to supplement his workers’ compensation allowance, so as to receive 100 percent compensation. The bill also requires the locality to continue to pay any employer's share of certain health insurance coverage for the injured deputy and his dependents. This bill is identical to
Title
Deputy sheriffs; locality allow those injured to use accrued leave to supplement workers' comp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 335 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1480ER) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 084791588-E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1480E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2008-01-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-16 | House: Presented and ordered printed 084791588 | |
2008-01-16 | House: Unanimous consent to introduce |
Same As/Similar To
SB673 (Same As) 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1480 |