VA HB1474 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0410)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0410)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dental hygiene; remote supervision. Eliminates the requirement that a dental hygienist providing dental hygiene services under remote supervision be employed by the supervising dentist; clarifies continuing education requirements for dental hygienists practicing under remote supervision; eliminates the requirement for written permission to treat a patient from a dentist who has treated the patient in the previous 12 months; and allows a dental hygienist practicing under remote supervision to treat a patient who provides verbal confirmation that he does not have a dentist of record whom he is seeing regularly. The bill eliminates the requirement that a dental hygienist practicing under remote supervision consult with the supervising dentist prior to providing further dental hygiene services if the patient is medically compromised or has periodontal disease and allows a dental hygienist practicing under remote supervision to provide further dental hygiene services in accordance with a written practice protocol developed and provided by the supervising dentist, which shall consider, at minimum, the medical complexity of the patient and the presenting signs and symptoms of oral disease. The bill requires a supervising dentist who conducts the examination of the patient or refers the patient to another dentist for examination following the 90-day period during which a dental hygienist is permitted to provide dental hygiene services under remote supervision to develop a diagnosis and treatment plan for the patient. The bill directs the Board of Dentistry to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the act within 280 days of its enactment.
Title
Dental hygienist; remote supervision.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Orrock [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0410) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 410 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1474ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (92-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100868D |