VA HB1470 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use of revenues by the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority. Includes transit projects in those transportation projects that will be rated by VDOT in accordance with § 33.2-257 before they are funded by the Authority. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2016.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority; use of revenues, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 458 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1470ER) |
2015-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 15100978D-E |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1470E |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100978D |