VA HB1453 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Hearings in the Supreme Court of Virginia; Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission. Clarifies that the hearings allowed under the Constitution related to complaints filed by the Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission are to be evidentiary hearings and that both the Commission and the judge are entitled to present evidence and argument during such hearings subject to any scheduling orders issued by the Court.
Title
Hearings in Supreme Court of Virginia; complaints filed by Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2011-01-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2010-11-22 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-11-22 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100644D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Courts of Record
Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission
Supreme Court of Virginia
Courts of Record
Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission
Supreme Court of Virginia
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1453 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1453+hil |