VA HB1442 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0862)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0862)
Summary
DUI ignition interlock limitations. Provides that a person who is required to have an ignition interlock may not operate a school bus or school vehicle. The bill has an effective date of October 1, 2008.
Title
Ignition interlock limitations; persons with restricted license not to operate certain vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0862) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 862 (effective 10/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1442ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 2-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (78-Y 20-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (78-Y 20-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (76-Y 22-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (76-Y 22-N) | |
2008-04-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1442ER) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-06 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 081578560-S1 (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1442S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 081578560-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 081578560-S1 | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (80-Y 18-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: --- ENGROSSMENT (84-Y 13-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute (84-Y 13-N) HB1442H2 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 081214560-H2 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute from Courts of Justice rejected 080867560-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 081214560-H2 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety (Sherwood) | |
2008-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 080867560-H1 | |
2008-02-01 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-15 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-15 | House: Presented and ordered printed 088327492 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1442 |