VA HB1430 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; crisis and emergency management plan; annual exercise. Requires each public institution of higher education to annually conduct a test or exercise in accordance with the protocols established by the institution's crisis and emergency management plan and certify in writing to the Department of Emergency Management that such a test or exercise was conducted. Under current law, each such institution is required to annually conduct a functional exercise in accordance with the protocols of such plan. The bill declares that the activation of its crisis and emergency management plan and completion of an after-action report by a public institution of higher education in response to an actual event or incident satisfies the requirement to conduct such a test or exercise. This bill is identical to SB 931.
Title
Higher educational institution, public; crisis and emergency management plan, annual exercise.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 201 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1430ER) |
2018-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1430H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105549D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105549D-H1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104817D |