VA HB1426 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Medicine; continuing education; human trafficking. Requires that, of the hours of continuing education required for renewal of licensure, any licensee of the Board of Medicine may be required by the Board of Medicine to complete up to two hours of continuing learning activities or courses in a specific subject area. Under the bill, if the Board of Medicine designates a subject area for continuing learning activities or courses, the first subject area shall be on the topic of human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking; continuing education required for biennial renewal of licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB1426ER) |
2023-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1426ER) |
2023-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1426H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23104888D-H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104888D-H1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100377D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1147 (Same As) 2023-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1147ER)
SB1147 (Same As) 2023-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1147ER)
SB1147 (Same As) 2023-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1147ER)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2400.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2912.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |