VA HB1415 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance disclosure reports; reviews. Provides a procedure for review of campaign finance reports for candidates for Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Attorney General and for candidates in a random sample of General Assembly districts. The review focuses on reconciling the balance in the campaign depository with campaign finance reports, on mathematical accuracy, and on completeness. The provisions would become effective on January 1, 2012.
Title
Campaign finance disclosure reports; reviews.
Sponsors
Del. James Scott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Privileges and Elections | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-13 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #3 Campaign Finance | |
2010-09-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-09-27 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100167D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 946 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 946.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 946.3:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1415 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1415+hil |