VA HB1378 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Registration of surgical assistants; renewal of registration. Provides that in cases in which a surgical assistant was initially registered on the basis of a credential as a surgical assistant or surgical first assistant issued by the National Board of Surgical Technology and Surgical Assisting, the National Surgical Assistant Association, or the National Commission for the Certification of Surgical Assistants or a successor thereof, the surgical assistant must attest that such credential is still current upon applying for renewal of his registration as a surgical assistant.
Title
Surgical assistants; renewal of registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 374 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1378ER) |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 18104212D-E |
2018-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1378E |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104212D |