VA HB1372 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1372
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Licensing of retailers of vapor products; penalty. Requires any person that engages in the retail sale of vapor products to register with the Department of Taxation as a retail dealer. The bill authorizes the Department to charge an application fee not to exceed its costs of enforcement and application processing. The bill provides for recordkeeping requirements and makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor to engage in fraud or misrepresentation in connection with an application. Licensing of retailers of vapor products; penalty. Requires any person that engages in the retail sale of vapor products to register with the Department of Taxation as a retail dealer. The bill authorizes the Department to charge an application fee not to exceed its costs of enforcement and application processing. The bill provides for recordkeeping requirements and makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor to engage in fraud or misrepresentation in connection with an application.
Title
Vapor products; licensing of retailers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101224D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1372 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 1021.04:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04:7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |