VA HB1337 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Summary
Child unattended in a car; penalty. Provides that it is unlawful for any person who is responsible for a child younger than six years of age to leave such child unattended in a motor vehicle if the conditions within the vehicle or in the immediate vicinity of the vehicle, including outside temperature, present a risk to the health or safety of the child. The penalty for a first offense is a $100 civil penalty, for a second offense a Class 4 misdemeanor, and for a third or subsequent offense a Class 3 misdemeanor.
Title
Children; unlawful for any person to leave in motor vehicle unattended child under age six.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-24 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred from Transportation by voice vote | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087010428 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1337 |