VA HB1326 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; E-911 dispatchers. Adds E-911 dispatchers to the list of local employees eligible to receive enhanced retirement benefits similar to those provided to State Police officers.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; E-911 dispatchers.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18103938D |