VA HB1304 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0261)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0261)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Information Technology Advisory Council; membership; powers and duties; report. Redefines the purpose and powers and duties of the Information Technology Advisory Council (the ITAC). The bill increases the membership of the ITAC from not more than 16 to not more than 20 members and allows for legislative members to be appointed to the ITAC. The bill also directs the Chief Information Officer of the Commonwealth to report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly regarding the work of the ITAC and any subcommittees. Finally, the bill provides that the ITAC may appoint advisory subcommittees consisting of individuals with expertise in particular subject areas and information technology to advise the ITAC on the utilization of nationally recognized technical and data standards in such subject, and repeals the provision that allows for the ITAC to create and appoint persons to a Health Information Technology Standards Advisory Committee.
Title
Information Technology Advisory Council; membership, powers and duties, report.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Block Vote (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Block Vote (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0261) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 261 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1304ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Delegates: Davis, Edmunds, Lopez |
2022-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Boysko, Hashmi, Dunnavant |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-23 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage Block Vote (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House Block Vote (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2022-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104376D |
Same As/Similar To
SB703 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
SB703 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
SB703 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1115.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2023 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |