VA HB1292 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Right to counsel; target of investigation. Provides that whenever a person is informed in writing by the attorney for the Commonwealth, the Attorney General, or counsel or special counsel for a multi-jurisdiction grand jury or special grand jury that he is the target of a criminal investigation for a criminal offense, the penalty for which may be confinement in the state correctional facility or jail, including charges for revocation of suspension of imposition or execution of sentence or probation, that target may present the written target letter to the clerk of the circuit court to set a hearing for the circuit court to inform him of his right to counsel and provide the target a reasonably opportunity to employ counsel, or if appropriate, execute a statement of indigence. The bill provides that the target letter, statement of indigence, other documents, and proceedings shall be sealed until such time as the target is charged with a criminal offense related to the target letter or until good cause is shown that they be unsealed.
Title
Right to counsel; target of investigation, accused appearing without counsel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104358D |