VA HB1285 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act; penalty. Creates the Virginia Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act. The act, created in new Article 9.1 of Chapter 4 of Title 18.2, prohibits an abortion after 20 weeks gestation unless, in reasonable medical judgment, the mother has a condition that so complicates her medical condition as to necessitate the abortion to avert her death or to avert serious risk of substantial and irreversible physical impairment of a major bodily function. The prohibition is predicated on the assertion that a fetus is capable of feeling pain at 20 weeks. When an abortion is not prohibited post-20 weeks gestation, the physician is required to terminate the pregnancy in a manner that would provide the unborn child the best opportunity to survive. The bill punishes an abortion in violation of the article as a Class 6 felony. The bill also provides for civil remedies against a physician who performs an abortion in violation of the article.
Title
Virginia Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act; created, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2012-02-10 | House | Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2012-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2012-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2012-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 12103711D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1285 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1285+hil |