VA HB1276 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive plan; healthy communities strategy. Authorizes cities with populations greater than 20,000 and counties with populations greater than 100,000 to consider, at the next and all subsequent reviews of the comprehensive plan, adopting a healthy communities strategy. The bill provides that the locality's strategy shall be to identify neighborhoods with major sources of pollution or hazardous waste, to identify objectives and policies to reduce health risks in such neighborhoods, to promote civic engagement by residents of such neighborhoods, and to prioritize improvements and programs that address the needs of such neighborhoods.
Title
Comprehensive plan; healthy communities strategy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104511D |