VA HB1273 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0217)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Organ, eye, or tissue transplantation; discrimination prohibited. Provides that an individual who is a candidate to receive an anatomical gift for organ, eye, or tissue transplantation and who is otherwise eligible to receive such gift shall not be deemed ineligible to receive an anatomical gift or denied services related to organ, eye, or tissue transplantation solely because of his physical, intellectual, developmental, or other disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organ, eye, or tissue transplantation; discrimination prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0217)
2020-03-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 217 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020
2020-02-26SenateSigned by President
2020-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1273ER)
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled
2020-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-30HouseRead first time
2020-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100281D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321297.2(n/a)See Bill Text
3823418.18(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1273&201+sum+HB1273
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1273+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1273ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0217+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1402V0005+HB1273
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0063+HB1273
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0095+HB1273
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0312+HB1273
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0150+HB1273
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0734HB1273+HB1273
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0751HB1273+HB1273

Bill Comments

feedback