VA HB127 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Academic year Governor's Schools; certain practices prohibited and required. Prohibits any academic year Governor's School or governing board member, director, administrator, or employee thereof from discriminating against any individual or group on the basis of race, sex, color, ethnicity, or national origin in the process of admitting students to such school. The bill requires each local school board that jointly manages and controls a regional academic year Governor's school to collaborate to ensure that each public middle school that is eligible to send students to attend such Governor's school offers coursework, curriculum, and instruction that is comparable in content and in rigor in order to provide each student in each such middle school with the opportunity to gain admission to and excel academically at such Governor's school. Academic year Governor's Schools; certain practices prohibited and required. Prohibits any academic year Governor's School or governing board member, director, administrator, or employee thereof from discriminating against any individual or group on the basis of race, sex, color, ethnicity, or national origin in the process of admitting students to such school. The bill requires each local school board that jointly manages and controls a regional academic year Governor's school to collaborate to ensure that each public middle school that is eligible to send students to attend such Governor's school offers coursework, curriculum, and instruction that is comparable in content and in rigor in order to provide each student in each such middle school with the opportunity to gain admission to and excel academically at such Governor's school.
Title
Governor's Schools, academic year; certain practices prohibited and required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (63-Y 35-N) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 485 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB127ER) |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (63-Y 35-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22107292D-S1 (63-Y 35-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (26-Y 13-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB127S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107292D-S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107292D-S1 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed House (50-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Pending question ordered |
2022-02-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 22103749D-E |
2022-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB127E |
2022-02-01 | House | Pending question ordered |
2022-02-01 | House | Amendments by Delegate Davis agreed to |
2022-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103749D |