VA HB127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Bystander claims for intentional or negligent infliction of injury or death; emotional distress. Provides that a bystander who witnesses, live and in-person, an event during which the intentional or negligent infliction of injury to or death of a victim occurs may recover damages for resulting emotional distress, proven by a preponderance of the evidence, with or without a physical impact or physical injury to the bystander, if (i) the bystander is related to the victim or (ii) although not related to the victim, the bystander is in close proximity to the victim at the time the event occurs and is aware that such event is causing injury to or the death of the victim.
Title
Intentional or negligent infliction of injury or death; bystander claims for emotional distress.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101772D |
Same As/Similar To
HB127 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB127 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB127+hil |