VA HB127 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Bystander claims for intentional or negligent infliction of injury or death; emotional distress. Provides that a bystander who witnesses, live and in-person, an event during which the intentional or negligent infliction of injury to or death of a victim occurs may recover damages for resulting emotional distress, proven by a preponderance of the evidence, with or without a physical impact or physical injury to the bystander, if (i) the bystander is related to the victim or (ii) although not related to the victim, the bystander is in close proximity to the victim at the time the event occurs and is aware that such event is causing injury to or the death of the victim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intentional or negligent infliction of injury or death; bystander claims for emotional distress.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-30HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2019-12-16HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-12-16HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101772D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80142.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback