VA HB127 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use of muzzleloading pistols. Allows persons to hunt big game with muzzleloading pistols of a caliber of .45 or greater where and in those seasons when the use of muzzleloading rifles is permitted. The bill authorizes the Board of Game and Inland Fisheries to adopt regulations that specify the types of muzzleloading pistols and projectiles and propellants that can be used. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Muzzleloading pistols; persons allowed to hunt big game with pistols in certain seasons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 117 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB127ER) |
2014-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources |
2013-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101210D |