VA HB126 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission; status of parole-eligible inmates; report. Directs the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission to review the status of all offenders who are housed in state facilities operated by the Department of Corrections and who are subject to consideration for parole. The bill directs the commission to determine the number of such offenders who have already served, or who within the next six years will have served, an amount of time in prison equal to or more than the amount of time for which they would have been sentenced for the same offense under the current sentencing guidelines. The bill requires the Commission to report its findings on or before October 1, 2018, to the Governor, the Chairmen of the Senate and House Committees for Courts of Justice, the Chairman of the Senate Committee on Finance, the Chairman of the House Committee on Appropriations, and the Chairman of the Virginia State Crime Commission. The Commission last performed such a review in 2009.
Title
Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission; status of parole-eligible inmates, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102158D |