VA HB1247 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Capital outlay plan. Updates the six-year capital outlay plan for projects to be funded entirely or partially from general fund-supported resources.
Title
Capital outlay plan; updates six-year plan for projects.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2020-03-12 | House | No further action taken |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Howell, Deeds, Newman |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Delegates: Torian, Hayes, Austin |
2020-02-27 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-27 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108131D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1247S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108131D-S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108131D-S1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1247H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106622D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106622D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104553D |